Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 403 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6330 Week
» 5068 Month
» 419389 Year
» 1640954 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2351 m/e 06/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5873 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 65873 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 06/1922
Withdrawal Sun 30/10/1966
Scrapping During 05/1967
Service Life 44 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1922
TWD Tweedmouth on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
54A Sunderland 3w/e 16/06/1956
54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 20/10/1956
52G Sunderland w/e 09/05/1959
   Withdrawn on 30/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 10/01/1948
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 16/05/1959
WDN   on 30/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1946 Superheater removed
02/1946 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1922 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2351
Built at Darlington Works
   
02/1946 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
02/1946 Modification Modification: Superheater removed    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5873    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tweedmouth (TWD)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65873    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
09/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
30/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 65873    

prev prev