Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 294 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18097 Week
» 71113 Month
» 190640 Year
» 3217493 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2353 |
m/e |
06/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5875 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65875 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1159 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 25/03/1963 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 9 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1922 |
SEL |
|
Selby |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
52F |
|
Blyth (North) |
4w/e |
19/10/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
25/03/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52FN |
|
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/03/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 09/1945 |
Superheater removed |
by 09/1945 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1922 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2353 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1159 |
|
|
09/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
09/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheater removed |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5875 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Selby (SEL) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65875 |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
03/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
25/03/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65875 |
|
|