Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 96 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6023 Week
» 4761 Month
» 419082 Year
» 1640647 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2385 m/e 06/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5887 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 65887 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 06/1923
Withdrawal w/e Mon 06/05/1963
Scrapping During 07/1963
Service Life 39 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1923
SKN Stockton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
50G Whitby 4w/e 23/12/1950
50A York (North) 4w/e 18/08/1951
52G Sunderland w/e 09/12/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 06/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50G Whitby m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 50A York (North) w/e 04/08/1951
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   on 06/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1942 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted
02/1955 LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted
10/1958 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1923 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2385
Built at Darlington Works
   
08/1942 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5887    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stockton (SKN)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65887    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Whitby (50G)    
18/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
02/1955 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted    
10/1958 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
09/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
06/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65887    

prev prev