Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3753 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17159 Week
» 70175 Month
» 189702 Year
» 3216555 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2386 |
m/e |
06/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5888 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
65888 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1195 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1923 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 09/12/1963 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
50G |
Whitby |
w/e |
04/08/1951 |
ALLOC |
50C |
Selby |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
ALLOC |
50F |
Malton |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
6w/e |
11/05/1963 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
w/e |
14/08/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/12/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 12/1945 |
Superheater removed |
by 12/1945 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1923 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2386 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1195 |
|
|
12/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
12/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheater removed |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5888 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65888 |
|
|
11/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
04/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Whitby (50G) |
|
|
18/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Whitby (50G) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
20/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
09/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65888 |
|
|
01/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|