Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 402 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6329 Week
» 5067 Month
» 419388 Year
» 1640953 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2390 m/e 08/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5892 on 24/03/1946
British Railways 65892 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 08/1923
Withdrawal Mon 07/08/1967
Scrapping During 12/1967
Service Life 44 yrs , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1923
NBH Blyth (North) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52B Heaton 4w/e 23/10/1954
54A Sunderland 3w/e 16/06/1956
51L Thornaby w/e 29/02/1964
52F Blyth (North) w/e 30/05/1964
52G Sunderland 4w/e 03/12/1966
   Withdrawn on 07/08/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NBH Blyth (North) on 13/04/1947
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 52FN   5w/e 13/06/1964
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 8w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   on 07/08/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1942 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted
09/1948 Superheater removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/01/1962 Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. SLS/196203
11/02/1962 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. SLS/196204
25/03/1962 Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) Ex-Works on 51A: D3072, D3874, D5108, 43055, 43101, 60835, 60939, 61019/39, 63388, 65794, 65889/92, 68011, 80116, 90072, 90342, 90503. Waiting works on 51A: 12115, 43070/5, 46494, 60811/44, 61237, 68754, 78015, 92098. SLS/196205
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (North Blyth) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701
02/07/1967 Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Sunderland) Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). SLS/196708

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1923 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2390
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/1942 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5892    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blyth (North) (NBH)    
09/1948 Modification Modification: Superheater removed    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65892    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
29/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
30/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
03/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
07/08/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65892    

prev prev