Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 345 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6272 Week
» 5010 Month
» 419331 Year
» 1640896 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2391 m/e 09/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5893 on 24/03/1946
British Railways 65893 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 09/1923
Withdrawal w/e Sun 31/07/1966
Scrapping During 12/1966
Service Life 42 yrs , 11 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1923
HTN Heaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
54A Sunderland 3w/e 16/06/1956
54C Borough Gardens 5w/e 14/06/1958
52F Blyth (North) w/e 20/06/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 31/07/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 52FN   4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 52F Blyth (North) 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 31/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1941 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted
08/1946 LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted
12/1949 Superheater removed
12/1949 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611
09/07/1961 Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) Waiting Works: D237, 60814, 61020, 63448, 67731/69, 78015, 90415. Ex-Works: 60872, 60928/42, 61273, 61303, 61448/64, 65801/93, 67636/90, 80099, 80100, 90465, 90710, 92147/92. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1923 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2391
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/1941 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5893    
08/1946 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65893    
12/1949 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
12/1949 Modification Modification: Superheater removed    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
31/07/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 65893    

prev prev