Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1701 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19504 Week
» 72520 Month
» 192047 Year
» 3218900 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
337 |
m/e |
12/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9337 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4523 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64523 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J35 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
To Service |
During 12/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 24/02/1961 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 2 mths , 25 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STM |
St Margarets |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/02/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/07/1961 |
Cowlairs Works (Scrap Road) |
Stripping Shop: 61342, 65902. Erecting Shop: 11713, 61132/97, 64864, 65903, 72005/9, 73078, 73120/51, 76097, 80124, 90097, GNS49. Works Yard: D2584, 72006. Works Shunters: D3393, 65228. Scrap Road: 40627, 56308, 64523, 64892, 67612. Waiting Works: 61101, 61341, 65915, 90542, 90753.Ex-Works : 90640. |
SLS/196108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1910 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 337 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9337 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4523 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64523 |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
24/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
24/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64523 |
|
|