Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 881 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14287 Week
» 67303 Month
» 186830 Year
» 3213683 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
689 |
m/e |
03/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9689 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5260 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65260 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3779 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1892 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 08/10/1962 off Kipps (65E) |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1892 |
KPS |
|
Kipps |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
65E |
|
Kipps |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
08/10/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
HIRE |
|
Bairds & Scottish Steel Ltd., Gartsherrie |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
65E |
Kipps |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
HIRE |
|
B. & S. S. Coy., Gartsherrie |
4w/e |
19/03/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1915 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
12/1915 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/09/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Scrapped) |
In Shops: 44724, 45066, 80126; awaiting shops-42737, 45475. Shopped during period 5/8-6/9: 42129, 65234, 65908/22, D6140/3/4. Scrapped during same period: 57565, 61260, 65210/41/60, 67606/15/49/74. Being cup up: 60851, 65316. Awaiting cut up: 60959, 64568, 90536/42. |
SLS/196310 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 689 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 3779 Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1915 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9689 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5260 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65260 |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
08/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65260 from Kipps (65E) |
|
|
08/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|