Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 506 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7189 Week
» 18235 Month
» 18235 Year
» 1683611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North British Railway 177 m/e 01/1893
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 9177 m/e 03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5274 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 65274 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3601/1893
J36 (0-6-0)05/1922
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 01/1893
Withdrawal Fri 08/12/1950 off Parkhead (65C)
Scrapping During 01/1951 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 57 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1893
PKD Parkhead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 08/12/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 08/12/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1922 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
05/1922 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
24/08/1947 Eastfield MPD On 24/8 the locos. on shed ex works were 'J39' 4923/33; 'J83' 8445 and 'J69' 8623, and further locos. ex works during August that have been noted here are: 'K2' 1757; 'J37' 4541/79/84, 4604/17/21; 'J39' 4711, 4818, 4929; 'C15' 7468; 'J88' 8345; 'J83' 8473 (green); 'N15' 9136/77 an 9222. SLS/194710
01/10/1949 Inverurie Works Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61513/43, 62281, 4476/87, 5218/59, 65274, 5276, 65321, 68467, 69129, ex L.M.S. 4189/94, 15268, 16352, 17288, 57306. SLS/194911

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1893 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 177
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
05/1922 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
05/1922 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9177    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5274    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65274    
08/12/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 65274 from Parkhead (65C)    

prev prev