Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 33 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1943 Week
» 2882 Month
» 206372 Year
» 1871748 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North British Railway 181 m/e 03/1893
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 9181 m/e 04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5270 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 65270 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3603/1893
J36 (0-6-0)07/1915
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 03/1893
Withdrawal Fri 14/02/1958 off Parkhead (65C)
Service Life 64 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1958 at Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1893
EFD   Eastfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65C   Parkhead 4w/e 06/07/1957
     Withdrawn on 14/02/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   on 14/02/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1915 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
07/1915 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1893 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 181
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
07/1915 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
07/1915 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9181    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5270    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 65270    
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
14/02/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 65270 from Parkhead (65C)    
03/1958 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Kilmarnock    

prev prev