Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 754 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6154 Week
» 24206 Month
» 257126 Year
» 1922502 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North British Railway 280 m/e 03/1893
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 9280 m/e 04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5273 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 65273 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3603/1893
J36 (0-6-0)04/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 03/1893
Withdrawal Thu 07/11/1963 off Ardrossan (67D)
Service Life 70 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Arnott Young (Troon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1893
EFD   Eastfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65C   Parkhead 4w/e 12/04/1958
67D   Ardrossan 4w/e 24/03/1962
     Withdrawn on 07/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 5w/e 10/03/1962
WDN   on 07/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1921 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
04/1921 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1950 Inverurie Works Engines due into Works, July 1950: 40613/65, 55136, 57299, 57338, 61505, 62231, 4482, 64534, 65228/36/73, 65309, 8749. SLS/195010

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1893 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 280
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
04/1921 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
04/1921 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9280    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5273    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65273    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
07/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65273 from Ardrossan (67D)    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon    

prev prev