Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2990 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16396 Week
» 69412 Month
» 188939 Year
» 3215792 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
727 |
m/e |
07/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9727 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5298 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65298 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 07/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 16/03/1951 off Blaydon (52C) |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1897 |
PKD |
|
Parkhead |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/03/1951 |
52CHEX |
|
|
w/e |
16/05/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
52CHEX |
|
w/e |
16/05/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1922 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
08/1922 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
10/1926 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1947 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
02/1947 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1947 |
General |
No. 514 was fitted with coal sprinkler on tender (1/47) and No. 5298 with - steam brake (2/47). No. 9522 has had the cylinders lined up to 15½' (1/47). |
SLS/194705 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1897 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 727 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1922 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1922 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9727 |
|
|
10/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5298 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65298 |
|
|
16/03/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65298 from Blaydon (52c) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Unknown: Unknown |
|
|
16/05/1951 |
Allocation |
|
|
|