Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 368 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6295 Week
» 5033 Month
» 419354 Year
» 1640919 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1448 on 28/09/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4700   03/11/1946
British Railways 64700   13/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 28/09/1926 to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Withdrawal Mon 17/04/1961 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 08/1961
Service Life 34 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Cowlairs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NPT Newport (Teeside) (New) on 28/09/1926
MID Middlesbrough on 07/04/1930
NPT Newport (Teeside) on 23/01/1936
DAR Darlington on 23/03/1943
BLA Blaydon on 03/08/1943
54C Borough Gardens on 04/01/1953
52A Gateshead on 14/06/1959
52G Sunderland on 01/11/1959
   Withdrawn on 17/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 52A Gateshead on 14/06/1959
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 17/04/1961
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/09/1926 Diagram 97 boiler fitted
01/06/1932 Westinghouse Brake removed
01/06/1932 Steam Brake fitted
13/08/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2303)
27/11/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1913)
27/11/1936 Steam Reverse Removed
27/11/1936 Screw Reverse fitted
10/05/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2617)
27/05/1941 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1905)
10/11/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number BP132)
22/09/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2843)
13/08/1949 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number BP137)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 29/05/1929 05/06/1929 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/01/1930 21/02/1930 46 days General  
Darlington Works 25/09/1930 30/10/1930 36 days Heavy
After derailment
 
Darlington Works 20/04/1932 01/06/1932 43 days General
Steam Brake fitted
 
Darlington Works 12/07/1932 18/07/1932 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 29/06/1934 13/08/1934 46 days General
Boiler number 2303 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 24/09/1934 02/10/1934 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 16/10/1936 27/11/1936 43 days General
Boiler number 1913 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
 
Darlington Works 22/03/1939 10/05/1939 50 days General
Boiler number 2617 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 28/04/1941 27/05/1941 30 days General
Boiler number 1905 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 23/10/1943 10/11/1943 19 days General
Boiler number BP132 (Diagram 97)
 
Gateshead Works 28/10/1944 14/11/1944 18 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 01/09/1945 22/09/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 27534 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 02/04/1946 09/04/1946 8 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 15/03/1947 12/04/1947 29 days Heavy  
Cowlairs Works 09/06/1947 12/07/1947 34 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 01/12/1947 27/12/1947 27 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 02/07/1949 13/08/1949 43 days General
Boiler number 27521 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64700
 
Cowlairs Works 16/05/1951 02/06/1951 18 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 21/08/1952 02/09/1952 13 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 12/12/1952 18/12/1952 7 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 04/03/1954 08/04/1954 36 days General
Boiler number 2625 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 30/08/1957 10/10/1957 42 days Heavy Intermediate  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/08/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. SLS/194910

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/09/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1448
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
07/04/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
23/01/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
23/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
03/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4700    
04/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
01/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
17/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64700 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev