Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 93 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6020 Week
» 4758 Month
» 419079 Year
» 1640644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1452 on 21/10/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4704   27/01/1946
British Railways 64704   20/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 21/10/1926 to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Withdrawal Mon 03/12/1962 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 08/1963
Service Life 36 yrs, 1 mth , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 21/10/1926
BLA Blaydon on 25/11/1927
GHD Gateshead on 18/09/1949
52G Sunderland on 01/11/1959
   Withdrawn on 03/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GHD Gateshead w/e 24/09/1949
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 03/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
21/10/1926 Diagram 97 boiler fitted
22/02/1933 Steam Brake fitted
22/02/1933 Westinghouse Brake removed
22/02/1933 Diagram 97 boiler fitted
04/04/1935 Screw Reverse fitted
04/04/1935 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1904)
04/04/1935 Steam Reverse Removed
28/05/1937 Diagram 97 boiler fitted
07/10/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2143)
18/04/1941 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1922)
18/11/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1913)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 19/10/1928 05/12/1928 48 days General  
Gateshead Works 31/01/1929 07/02/1929 8 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gateshead Works 25/08/1930 09/10/1930 46 days General  
Darlington Works 17/01/1933 22/02/1933 37 days General
Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 97)
Steam Brake fitted
 
Darlington Works 25/02/1935 04/04/1935 39 days General
Boiler number 1904 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
 
Darlington Works 01/07/1936 28/08/1936 59 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 21/04/1937 28/05/1937 38 days General
Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 06/09/1939 07/10/1939 32 days General
Boiler number 2143 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 18/03/1941 18/04/1941 32 days General
Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 25/10/1944 18/11/1944 25 days General
Boiler number 1913 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 05/05/1945 19/05/1945 15 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 12/08/1947 27/09/1947 47 days General  
Cowlairs Works 26/04/1950 20/05/1950 25 days Heavy Intermediate
Renumbered to BR 64704
 
Cowlairs Works 27/01/1953 28/02/1953 33 days General
Boiler number 2564 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 03/07/1956 11/08/1956 40 days Heavy Intermediate  
Inverurie Works 18/02/1960 21/04/1960 64 days General
Boiler number 27550 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 02/10/1961 14/10/1961 13 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
24/08/1947 Cowlairs Works On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. SLS/194710
30/10/1947 Eastfield MPD Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. SLS/194712

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/10/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1452
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
25/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
27/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4704    
18/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
01/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
03/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64704 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev