Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 414 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6341 Week
» 5079 Month
» 419400 Year
» 1640965 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1455 on 21/10/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4706   16/06/1946
British Railways 64706   23/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Thu 21/10/1926 to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Withdrawal Thu 29/03/1962 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 09/1962
Service Life 35 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NPT Newport (Teeside) (New) on 21/10/1926
SBK Starbeck on 26/06/1939
50A York (North) on 13/09/1959
51L Thornaby on 22/11/1959
52G Sunderland on 21/01/1962
   Withdrawn on 29/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50A York (North) on 13/09/1959
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 5w/e 03/02/1962
WDN   on 29/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
21/10/1926 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1913)
04/05/1932 Steam Brake fitted
04/05/1932 Westinghouse Brake removed
31/05/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2309)
25/04/1936 Screw Reverse fitted
25/04/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2129)
25/04/1936 Steam Reverse Removed
18/04/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted
09/09/1942 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number BP142)
12/07/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4922)
08/12/1951 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27594)
21/04/1956 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27725)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 19/10/1928 31/10/1928 13 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 16/01/1929 13/03/1929 57 days General  
Darlington Works 22/01/1930 18/03/1930 56 days General  
Darlington Works 18/07/1930 22/08/1930 36 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Darlington Works 22/03/1932 04/05/1932 44 days General
Steam Brake fitted
 
Darlington Works 01/05/1934 31/05/1934 31 days General
Boiler number 2309 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 13/03/1936 25/04/1936 44 days General
Boiler number 2129 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
 
Darlington Works 25/02/1938 12/04/1938 47 days General  
Darlington Works 19/03/1940 18/04/1940 31 days General
Boiler number 27455 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 19/03/1941 28/03/1941 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 12/11/1941 15/12/1941 34 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 25/07/1942 09/09/1942 47 days General
Boiler number BP142 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 22/07/1944 26/08/1944 36 days General  
Cowlairs Works 14/04/1945 28/04/1945 15 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 12/01/1946 16/02/1946 36 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 12/04/1947 12/07/1947 92 days General
Boiler number 4922 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 28/11/1949 24/12/1949 27 days Heavy Intermediate
Renumbered to BR 64706
 
Cowlairs Works 14/11/1951 08/12/1951 25 days General
Boiler number 27594 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 05/02/1954 13/03/1954 37 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 15/03/1956 21/04/1956 38 days General
Boiler number 27725 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 03/10/1958 01/11/1958 30 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 02/07/1959 08/07/1959 7 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 24/10/1960 07/11/1960 15 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 01/08/1961 12/08/1961 12 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. SLS/194908
30/11/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. SLS/195001
13/09/1959 Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. SLS/195911

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/10/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1455
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
26/06/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK)    
16/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4706    
13/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
22/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
21/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
29/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64706 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev