Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 652 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 652 Week
» 19553 Month
» 19553 Year
» 1684929 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1493 on 03/12/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4714   22/06/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E4714   11/02/1948
British Railways 64714   08/02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 03/12/1926 to Immingham (IMM)
Withdrawal Fri 22/05/1959 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 09/1959
Service Life 32 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham (New) on 03/12/1926
GOR Gorton on 13/02/1931
LIN Lincoln on 10/06/1931
ARD Ardsley on 06/07/1939
DON Doncaster on 19/10/1941
NWE New England on 16/04/1942
GOR Gorton on 10/06/1943
LIV Brunswick on 06/04/1947
GOR Gorton on 13/05/1948
40A Lincoln on 13/06/1954
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 04/01/1959
   Withdrawn on 22/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIV Brunswick on 06/04/1947
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 24/01/1959
WDN   on 22/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/12/1926 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1922)
15/07/1933 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8022)
06/09/1935 Steam Reverse Removed
06/09/1935 Screw Reverse fitted
06/09/1935 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2182)
29/01/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2123)
05/10/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2093)
30/10/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2119)
16/02/1946 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2766)
11/02/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2932)
10/10/1952 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27723)
18/06/1955 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27696)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 28/01/1929 20/02/1929 24 days General  
Gorton Works 17/10/1930 15/11/1930 30 days General  
Gorton Works 16/06/1933 15/07/1933 30 days General
Boiler number 27460 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 29/07/1935 06/09/1935 40 days General
Boiler number 2182 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
 
Gorton Works 06/01/1938 29/01/1938 24 days General
Boiler number 2123 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1940 05/10/1940 54 days General
Boiler number 2093 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1943 30/10/1943 71 days General
Boiler number 2119 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1945 16/02/1946 84 days General
Boiler number 2766 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1947 11/02/1948 64 days General
Boiler number 2932 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4714
 
Derby Works 05/12/1950 08/02/1951 66 days Light Intermediate
Renumbered to BR 64714
 
Derby Works 12/02/1951 14/02/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 22/02/1951 08/03/1951 15 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 20/03/1951 13/04/1951 25 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 17/04/1952 18/04/1952 2 days W  
Derby Works 25/08/1952 10/10/1952 47 days General
Boiler number 27723 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 16/05/1955 18/06/1955 34 days General
Boiler number 27696 (Diagram 97)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/01/1951 Derby Works During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. SLS/195102
31/01/1951 Derby Works During the second half of January new construction comprised some work on Nos. 73000/1, the cylinders of the former being positioned. No. 10100 has been outside the diesel shop for some days. Condemned locos. in the Works yard: 40370, 41012, 41824 (from W.R.), also the N.L. Crane 58865. No. 22853 was still in Works, not cut up, on 26/1. In store near the station: 43429 (17C), and 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361 (17A), all 17A. Engines from other Regions under repair: 42328, 42506/23, 58043 (33A), 42394 (87K), 44518 (35C), 64728 (40A), 64751, 64911 (37A), 64987 (36C). Most engines now leave shops with the B.R. emblem, but 42371 an 47473 have come off lettered BRITISH RAILWAYS, while tenders so lettered are attached to 43757, 44576 an 58265. Engines off shops with tanks or tenders lettered L.M.S. are 42335, 41101, 43395, 44002/15: apparently Derby has a lingering affection for this lettering, which became obsolete three years ago!! W2043 has come off without emblem, but with W prefix under the numberplate. No. 58071, lined with emblem, is freshly out still with round-topped firebox. Several J.39 class have come off shops, 64793, 64910/79 (repainted with emblem) and 64714 (renumbered-with emblem-but not repainted). Un-renumbered engines in shops include 326 (20A), 580 (27D), 7295 (12A), 7339 (11A), 7391 (12A). No. 326 is the last of the S. & D.J. engines to get its B.R. number, which will be its fourth: originally No. 69, it became 43 in 1928, and 326 in March 1930. Latterly it has been working in the Leeds area. SLS/195103

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/12/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1493
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Immingham (IMM)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
13/02/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
10/06/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
06/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
19/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
16/04/1942 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
10/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4714    
06/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
13/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
04/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
22/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64714 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev