Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 452 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7135 Week
» 18181 Month
» 18181 Year
» 1683557 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1265 on 13/05/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4725   30/03/1946
British Railways 64725   26/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sun 13/05/1927 to Immingham (IMM)
Withdrawal Sun 22/10/1961 off Thornaby (51L)
Scrapping During 01/1962
Service Life 34 yrs, 5 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Cowlairs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham (New) on 13/05/1927
STR Stratford on 13/10/1927
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street on 07/08/1933
DON Doncaster on 01/09/1933
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 26/09/1933
GOR Gorton on 16/10/1933
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 13/12/1942
GOR Gorton on 30/09/1945
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 17/10/1947
LIN Lincoln on 25/09/1949
53A Hull Dairycoates on 02/09/1951
50C Selby on 10/10/1954
50B Neville Hill on 15/09/1957
50C Selby on 26/07/1959
50A York (North) on 13/09/1959
51L Thornaby on 13/12/1959
   Withdrawn on 22/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall on 17/10/1947
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates on 02/09/1951
ALLOC 50C Selby 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 50C Selby 4w/e 08/08/1959
ALLOC 50A York (North) on 13/09/1959
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   on 22/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
13/05/1927 Diagram 97 boiler fitted
20/02/1932 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8012)
14/04/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2145)
07/08/1936 Steam Reverse Removed
07/08/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8589)
07/08/1936 Screw Reverse fitted
28/01/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2094)
12/08/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2106)
26/02/1949 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2674)
30/03/1951 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27661)
10/03/1956 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27542)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 29/06/1929 26/07/1929 28 days General  
Stratford Works 22/11/1930 31/12/1930 40 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 27/01/1932 20/02/1932 25 days General
Boiler number 8012 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1934 14/04/1934 24 days General
Sent to Gorton
Boiler number 2145 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 16/07/1936 07/08/1936 23 days General
Boiler number 8589 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
 
Gorton Works 05/01/1939 28/01/1939 24 days General
Boiler number 2094 (Diagram 97)
 
Doncaster Works 08/11/1941 13/12/1941 36 days General  
Gorton Works 18/07/1944 12/08/1944 26 days General
Boiler number 2106 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1945 03/03/1945 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 24/03/1947 12/04/1947 20 days General  
Gorton Works 01/02/1949 26/02/1949 26 days General
Boiler number 2674 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64725
 
Derby Works 28/02/1951 30/03/1951 31 days General
Boiler number 27661 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 09/10/1953 08/12/1953 61 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 21/05/1954 12/06/1954 23 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 24/01/1956 10/03/1956 47 days General
Boiler number 27542 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 30/05/1960 24/06/1960 26 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1951 Derby Works During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned.
At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic.
SLS/195104
13/09/1959 Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. SLS/195911

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/05/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1265
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Immingham (IMM)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
13/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
07/08/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
01/09/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
26/09/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
16/10/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
13/12/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
30/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4725    
17/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
25/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
10/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (50C)    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
26/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (50C)    
13/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
13/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
22/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64725 from Thornaby (51L)    

prev prev