|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1929 | 05/09/1929 | 45 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1932 | 12/03/1932 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 824 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1934 | 15/12/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2123 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1937 | 04/09/1937 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2273 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1940 | 06/04/1940 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2302 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 14/10/1942 | 05/12/1942 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 2188 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 18/06/1944 | 21/07/1944 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 29/07/1945 | 13/10/1945 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 2689 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/03/1948 | 24/05/1948 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 2205 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64726 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1950 | 04/03/1950 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Derby Works | 06/04/1951 | 16/05/1951 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27663 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 20/09/1953 | 24/10/1953 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27876 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 23/07/1956 | 14/09/1956 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 27785 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/04/1951 | Derby Works | By mid-April, 73000 was finished, painted grey and running trials. Engines from other regions entering works were 42305 (87K), 42513 (33A), 64759 (36E), 64721 (36A), 42514 (33A), 64726 (32A), 64788 (30F). Position of engines stored not materially altered. | SLS/195105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/05/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1266 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1361 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
14/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
23/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1929. Dep: 05/09/1929. | ||
15/03/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southend on Sea (?) | ||
26/04/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
30/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1932. Dep: 12/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 824 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1934. Dep: 15/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2123 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1937. Dep: 04/09/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2273 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1940. Dep: 06/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2302 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
24/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
31/12/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
14/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1942. Dep: 05/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2188 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
24/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
18/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/06/1944. Dep: 21/07/1944. | ||
29/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1945. Dep: 13/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2689 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
19/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4726 | ||
26/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
21/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1948. Dep: 24/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2205 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64726 |
||
10/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/02/1950. Dep: 04/03/1950. | ||
06/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1951. Dep: 16/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27663 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1953. Dep: 24/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27876 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/05/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
23/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1956. Dep: 14/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27785 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) | ||
19/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
30/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
22/11/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64726 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
12/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |