|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1929 | 24/08/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1932 | 27/02/1932 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 2284 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/10/1934 | 20/10/1934 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 8019 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1934 | 10/12/1934 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1935 | 26/01/1935 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 8583 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1937 | 12/03/1937 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2097 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1939 | 30/09/1939 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2205 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 30/04/1942 | 21/07/1942 | 83 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 01/08/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 8775 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1948 | 10/04/1948 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 2122 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted Renumbered to BR 64730 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/04/1950 | 15/04/1950 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Derby Works | 11/12/1950 | 08/02/1951 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 27655 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/01/1954 | 20/02/1954 | 39 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/10/1956 | 17/11/1956 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27590 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/12/1956 | 15/12/1956 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/03/1957 | 30/03/1957 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/04/1957 | 11/05/1957 | 18 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/01/1951 | Derby Works | During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. | SLS/195102 |
28/02/1951 | Derby Works | During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned. At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic. |
SLS/195104 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington MPD (Awaiting Works) | Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/05/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1268 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1365 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
14/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
27/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1929. Dep: 24/08/1929. | ||
08/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1932. Dep: 27/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2284 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1934. Dep: 20/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8019 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1934. Dep: 10/12/1934. | ||
14/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1935. Dep: 26/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8583 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1937. Dep: 12/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2097 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2205 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1942. Dep: 21/07/1942. | ||
05/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
01/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8775 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
31/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4730 | ||
02/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
09/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1948. Dep: 10/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2122 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted Renumbered to BR 64730 |
||
16/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
22/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
08/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/04/1950. Dep: 15/04/1950. | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
11/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1950. Dep: 08/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27655 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
17/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
13/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 13/01/1954. Dep: 20/02/1954. | ||
26/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
19/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1956. Dep: 17/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27590 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/12/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956. | ||
14/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1957. Dep: 30/03/1957. | ||
24/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/04/1957. Dep: 11/05/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
16/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64730 from Thornaby (51L) | ||
02/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |