|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1929 | 25/09/1929 | 33 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1931 | 19/09/1931 | 44 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1934 | 07/06/1934 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 2108 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1936 | 22/10/1936 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 8774 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1938 | 08/03/1938 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 13/09/1939 | 11/11/1939 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 2097 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1942 | 21/11/1942 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 8588 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/03/1945 | 09/06/1945 | 84 days | General | Boiler number 8587 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1947 | 16/12/1947 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 2210 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 03/08/1950 | 03/10/1950 | 62 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64737 |
||
Derby Works | 20/10/1950 | 25/10/1950 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 06/06/1953 | 15/08/1953 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 27872 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1956 | 04/08/1956 | 56 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27654 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1950 | Derby Works | For works: 12000, 40012/51/8, 40353, 414, 40498, 40515, 527, 40567, 684, 40917/26/8, 41017/58/72/7/81, 41124/60/9, 41710, 1748, 41961, 42508/15, 3099, 43216/24, 3271, 43283, 3484, 43538, 3738/59/60, 43835/54/62, 43909/16/29/94, 44020/45/94/6, 44137, 44414/33/75, 44566, 47220, 7237, 47287, 7324, 47356, 7395, 7403/5/17/51, 47506, 7507,7542/81, 58033, 1406, 58080, 58224, W.2108 and 'J.39' 4721/37/85, 64980, 4956. Ex Works: 42146, UTA.57, 12070-3 (new): and after repair 40410, 40535/56, 40929, 41088, 41535, 41672, 41752, 41889, 42353, 42510, 43224, 43446, 43574, 43690, 44127/37/90, 44242, 44362, 44414/72, 44521, 47280, 47342/56/65, 47426, 47526, 58220/4/9, 64762/84/97, 64960 and 2097. New Construction, in various stages 2-6-4T 42050-4 (Order 4310) and D/E 12074/5 almost complete. Being cut up 41034, 58036 (24/8). The works yard contained 22853, 43818, 43297, 41017, 3511, 40515 (all condemned) and 58033, 1406, 40498 (under consideration). | SLS/195012 |
07/10/1950 | Derby Works | For Works: W/E 7/10/50:-50 1A, 40332 5A, 40478 16A, 41165 2A, 41181 9E, 1186 26C, 41187 27A, 41686 16A, 42362 9A, 42395 11B, 43795 18A, 43992 18B, 44175 22B, 44400 20E, 7674 6C, 53803 22C, 58059 15D, (6)4782 30A, 64807 38A. Ex Works: 41050, 43435, 64737, 43456, 44180, 58090, 58237. | SLS/195012 |
21/10/1950 | Derby Works | For Works: W/E 21/10/50, 40405 5C, 40505 71H, 40522 8E, 40743 20A, 41123 7A, 42184 16A, 42332 9B, 42374 33A, 42521 33D, 43212 18C, 44166 17B, 4267 22A, 44524 21A, 7096 1A, 7441 15C, 47469 23C, 20155 16A, 23006 3E, 58247 17C, (W) 2107 84F, 64834 32B, 64958 30A. The most interesting items are 40743 for intermediate repair, and 20155 (the last 2-4-0-Midland-for special examination which usually means condemnation). New construction: 42054 on trials 18/10, 42055/6 completed, 42057-60 in various stages; 12078 in paint shop 18/10, 12079-81 complete, 12082-4 in various stages. Ex works 40532/655, 41004/67, 42509/22, 42325, 47410, 64721/37/57, 64956/80 (W/E 18/10), 40584, 41001/60, 41153/65/81, 41833, 42345, 43586, 43992, 47340, 47674, 64883 (W/E 25/10). Cut up: 15-18/10/50. Nos. 1251 an 1406 (old Nos.). No. 58236, in paint shop 18/10 with R/T boiler. Stored: 407, 40418/513/556/632, 43342/64, 3368, 43482, 43200. (25/10). |
SLS/195012 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/06/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1286 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1372 Allocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
24/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1929. Dep: 25/09/1929. | ||
07/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1931. Dep: 19/09/1931. | ||
18/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1934. Dep: 07/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2108 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1936. Dep: 22/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8774 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/12/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
21/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/02/1938. Dep: 08/03/1938. | ||
13/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1939. Dep: 11/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2097 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
26/03/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1942. Dep: 21/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8588 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
05/11/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shoeburyness (13D) | ||
01/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
18/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8587 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4737 | ||
22/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
30/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1947. Dep: 16/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2210 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 03/08/1950. Dep: 03/10/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64737 |
||
20/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1950. Dep: 25/10/1950. | ||
06/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1953. Dep: 15/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27872 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1956. Dep: 04/08/1956. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27654 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/08/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64737 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
09/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |