|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1929 | 13/04/1929 | 46 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1931 | 05/12/1931 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 8016 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1934 | 07/04/1934 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2122 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1936 | 07/05/1936 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 2318 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1937 | 26/06/1937 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2287 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1938 | 27/05/1938 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1938 | 02/12/1938 | 26 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1940 | 11/01/1941 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 2284 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1944 | 13/05/1944 | 91 days | General | Boiler number 2291 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1945 | 29/09/1945 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 21/03/1947 | 03/07/1947 | 105 days | General | Boiler number E1351 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/07/1947 | 31/07/1947 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1948 | 24/12/1948 | 39 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64743 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1949 | 07/01/1950 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 27710 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 02/06/1952 | 07/08/1952 | 67 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1954 | 03/04/1954 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 27653 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1956 | 22/09/1956 | 36 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27784 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/09/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1298 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1378 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
20/02/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
27/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1929. Dep: 13/04/1929. | ||
23/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8016 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1934. Dep: 07/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2122 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1936. Dep: 07/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2318 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
01/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1937. Dep: 26/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2287 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1938. Dep: 27/05/1938. | ||
07/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/11/1938. Dep: 02/12/1938. | ||
17/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1940. Dep: 11/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2284 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1944. Dep: 13/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2291 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/09/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945. | ||
11/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4743 | ||
21/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1947. Dep: 03/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number E1351 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/07/1947. Dep: 31/07/1947. | ||
16/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1948. Dep: 24/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64743 |
||
09/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 07/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27710 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/06/1952. Dep: 07/08/1952. | ||
13/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1954. Dep: 03/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27653 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1956. Dep: 22/09/1956. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27784 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/01/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64743 from Gorton (9G) | ||
03/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |