|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/01/1932 | 06/02/1932 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 8003 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1934 | 05/05/1934 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2216 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1936 | 26/02/1936 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2093 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1938 | 05/03/1938 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2294 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1940 | 04/05/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/07/1942 | 12/09/1942 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 2666 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1943 | 15/01/1944 | 17 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1944 | 10/03/1945 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 2769 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1946 | 19/10/1946 | 107 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4762 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1947 | 18/02/1948 | 87 days | General | Boiler number 2309 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4762 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1948 | 19/11/1948 | 88 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64762 |
||
Derby Works | 15/05/1950 | 20/08/1950 | 98 days | General | Boiler number 4917 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1953 | 25/04/1953 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 27754 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1953 | 23/05/1953 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1954 | 09/10/1954 | 72 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1955 | 29/10/1955 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 27795 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1955 | 30/11/1955 | 26 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1957 | 30/11/1957 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 27888 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1958 | 26/04/1958 | 18 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1950 | Derby Works | For works: 12000, 40012/51/8, 40353, 414, 40498, 40515, 527, 40567, 684, 40917/26/8, 41017/58/72/7/81, 41124/60/9, 41710, 1748, 41961, 42508/15, 3099, 43216/24, 3271, 43283, 3484, 43538, 3738/59/60, 43835/54/62, 43909/16/29/94, 44020/45/94/6, 44137, 44414/33/75, 44566, 47220, 7237, 47287, 7324, 47356, 7395, 7403/5/17/51, 47506, 7507,7542/81, 58033, 1406, 58080, 58224, W.2108 and 'J.39' 4721/37/85, 64980, 4956. Ex Works: 42146, UTA.57, 12070-3 (new): and after repair 40410, 40535/56, 40929, 41088, 41535, 41672, 41752, 41889, 42353, 42510, 43224, 43446, 43574, 43690, 44127/37/90, 44242, 44362, 44414/72, 44521, 47280, 47342/56/65, 47426, 47526, 58220/4/9, 64762/84/97, 64960 and 2097. New Construction, in various stages 2-6-4T 42050-4 (Order 4310) and D/E 12074/5 almost complete. Being cut up 41034, 58036 (24/8). The works yard contained 22853, 43818, 43297, 41017, 3511, 40515 (all condemned) and 58033, 1406, 40498 (under consideration). | SLS/195012 |
15/09/1950 | Derby Works | For works during first half of September: 40653 4B, 41050/9 14B, 41065 23C, 41118 8E, 42325 14B, 42533 33A, 43754 22B, 43959 18C, 43968 and M4010 21A, 44164 an 44402 17A, 44174 17D, 7588 5C, 7635 22B, 58137 16C, 64883 40A, 40410 35C, 41062 19B, 41068 20A, 1251 (58034) 22B, 42339 16A, 42344 5D, 42345 5C, 43246 an 43435 21A, 43344 22B, 3650 18A, 43819 18A, 43925 20D, 44180 17C, 44355 22A, 7481 87K, 22945 (58136) 20B, 58237 20C, 64757 38A, 64959 32A, 40001 11A, 40351 20A, 426 17A, 41001 22B, 41004 20E, 41006 15C, 41067 20E, 41095 15C, 41154 9E, 1429 (58090) 20C, 42364 5D, 42509 33C, 42512 33C, 3456 20A, 3914 18D, 44598 16A, 47548 19A, 58209 19B, 64798 38E. New Construction: No. 42050 was ex Paint Shop on 6/9, and others up to 42057 were in various stages in the Erecting Shop. Diesels 12074/5 were completed and others up to 12079 in course of construction. No. 42146 was on trials on 6/9. Nos. 404, 40411/6 have gone into traffic ex store, but Nos. 407, 40513, 43342/64, 43482 are in store, near the station. Withdrawn: still in works Yard: 40498, 40515, 41017, 43297, 43818, 22853 (58112), 3511 (58275), 1251 (58034) and 1406 (58079). No. 41748 is ex Works, with round-top firebox. No. 58080 (0-4-4T) has appeared fully lined, with emblem. Among those repainted black with emblem are 2108 (0-6-OPT), and J.39 Nos. 64762/5/84/97, 64903/62/9, while 64906/51 still retain BRITISH RAILWAYS (not repainted). |
SLS/195012 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/09/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2709 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1423 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
31/10/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
24/06/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
07/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
20/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
20/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
05/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
21/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
15/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1932. Dep: 06/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8003 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2216 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1936. Dep: 26/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2093 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1938. Dep: 05/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2294 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1942. Dep: 12/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2666 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1943. Dep: 15/01/1944. | ||
30/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1944. Dep: 10/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2769 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4762 |
||
30/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
24/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1947. Dep: 18/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2309 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4762 |
||
24/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/08/1948. Dep: 19/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64762 |
||
15/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1950. Dep: 20/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4917 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27754 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1953. Dep: 23/05/1953. | ||
30/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1954. Dep: 09/10/1954. | ||
16/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1955. Dep: 29/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27795 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/11/1955. Dep: 30/11/1955. | ||
14/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1957. Dep: 30/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27888 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/04/1958. Dep: 26/04/1958. | ||
29/06/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64762 from Colwick (40E) | ||
09/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |