|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/09/1931 | 31/10/1931 | 40 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1935 | 02/02/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2103 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1937 | 03/07/1937 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 8008 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1939 | 03/02/1940 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 23/01/1943 | 04/06/1943 | 133 days | General | Boiler number 824 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 16/01/1944 | 07/04/1944 | 83 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 06/09/1945 | 27/10/1945 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2688 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 17/03/1947 | 10/06/1947 | 86 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1948 | 28/05/1948 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 2282 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64775 |
||
Stratford Works | 05/06/1948 | 08/06/1948 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1948 | 23/01/1949 | 48 days | Light Repair | |||
Derby Works | 16/11/1951 | 08/02/1952 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 27808 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 30/12/1954 | 29/01/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27846 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/12/1957 | 18/01/1958 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27674 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/04/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2722 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1446 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
18/04/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
25/04/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
22/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1931. Dep: 31/10/1931. | ||
03/04/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
12/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1935. Dep: 02/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2103 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1937. Dep: 03/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8008 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
28/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1939. Dep: 03/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1943. Dep: 04/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 824 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/01/1944. Dep: 07/04/1944. | ||
06/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2688 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4775 | ||
17/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1947. Dep: 10/06/1947. | ||
19/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1948. Dep: 28/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2282 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64775 |
||
05/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/06/1948. Dep: 08/06/1948. | ||
07/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/12/1948. Dep: 23/01/1949. | ||
16/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1951. Dep: 08/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27808 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1954. Dep: 29/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27846 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1957. Dep: 18/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27674 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/08/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64775 from Stratford (30A) | ||
10/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |