|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 01/06/1929 | 06/06/1929 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/01/1931 | 06/03/1931 | 38 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/09/1932 | 18/11/1932 | 53 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/02/1935 | 02/03/1935 | 3 days | General | Boiler number C1711 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/03/1935 | 13/03/1935 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/09/1936 | 31/10/1936 | 40 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/08/1938 | 16/09/1938 | 25 days | General | Boiler number C1710 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/06/1940 | 15/07/1940 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/09/1941 | 23/09/1941 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/03/1942 | 11/04/1942 | 40 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/11/1943 | 08/12/1943 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 4916 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/02/1944 | 08/03/1944 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/11/1945 | 15/12/1945 | 25 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 04/11/1947 | 21/11/1947 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1948 | 25/09/1948 | 49 days | General | Water scoop off Boiler number E1350 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64784 |
||
Derby Works | 31/05/1950 | 30/08/1950 | 92 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 25/04/1952 | 20/06/1952 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 27434 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/06/1955 | 30/07/1955 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27431 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 13/02/1957 | 22/03/1957 | 38 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 30/04/1958 | 30/05/1958 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27891 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 03/06/1958 | 13/06/1958 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 05/01/1960 | 25/01/1960 | 21 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/06/1950 | Derby Works | Engines into works: 60, 40063, 656, 41043, 41064, 1341, 41535, 41904, 42340, 42377, 43203, 43310, 3511, 4179, 44241, 44555, 58070, 64784, 64841, 64797, 64903 and pannier tank 2070. A number of J.39's are now shopped at Derby. Ex works in lined black with emblem 40007, 40409, 40586, 41117: un-lined ditto 47292, 47305, 47432, 43521, 43960, 44136, 43657, 12024, 2182 (pannier tank), 41779 (retaining R.T. Firebox and Salter safety-valves), still lettered L.M.S. 40700, 41078, 43978, 58240 (retaining round-topped firebox and Salter safety-valves). Cut up between 31/5/50 and 16/6/50: 40516, 2096 (Tilbury Tank), 3805 (3F). New Construction: Ulster Transport Authority Nos. 54 and 55 completed; 56 boiler fitted; 57 frames only. B.R. 42145 completed; 42146 frames only; 12069/70 ex works. Running trials: 10800 0-4-4-0 Diesel, N.B. Loco. Co. 26413/50; Davey-Paxman Diesel engine, electrical equipment by B.T.H. Co. | SLS/195008 |
31/08/1950 | Derby Works | For works: 12000, 40012/51/8, 40353, 414, 40498, 40515, 527, 40567, 684, 40917/26/8, 41017/58/72/7/81, 41124/60/9, 41710, 1748, 41961, 42508/15, 3099, 43216/24, 3271, 43283, 3484, 43538, 3738/59/60, 43835/54/62, 43909/16/29/94, 44020/45/94/6, 44137, 44414/33/75, 44566, 47220, 7237, 47287, 7324, 47356, 7395, 7403/5/17/51, 47506, 7507,7542/81, 58033, 1406, 58080, 58224, W.2108 and 'J.39' 4721/37/85, 64980, 4956. Ex Works: 42146, UTA.57, 12070-3 (new): and after repair 40410, 40535/56, 40929, 41088, 41535, 41672, 41752, 41889, 42353, 42510, 43224, 43446, 43574, 43690, 44127/37/90, 44242, 44362, 44414/72, 44521, 47280, 47342/56/65, 47426, 47526, 58220/4/9, 64762/84/97, 64960 and 2097. New Construction, in various stages 2-6-4T 42050-4 (Order 4310) and D/E 12074/5 almost complete. Being cut up 41034, 58036 (24/8). The works yard contained 22853, 43818, 43297, 41017, 3511, 40515 (all condemned) and 58033, 1406, 40498 (under consideration). | SLS/195012 |
15/09/1950 | Derby Works | For works during first half of September: 40653 4B, 41050/9 14B, 41065 23C, 41118 8E, 42325 14B, 42533 33A, 43754 22B, 43959 18C, 43968 and M4010 21A, 44164 an 44402 17A, 44174 17D, 7588 5C, 7635 22B, 58137 16C, 64883 40A, 40410 35C, 41062 19B, 41068 20A, 1251 (58034) 22B, 42339 16A, 42344 5D, 42345 5C, 43246 an 43435 21A, 43344 22B, 3650 18A, 43819 18A, 43925 20D, 44180 17C, 44355 22A, 7481 87K, 22945 (58136) 20B, 58237 20C, 64757 38A, 64959 32A, 40001 11A, 40351 20A, 426 17A, 41001 22B, 41004 20E, 41006 15C, 41067 20E, 41095 15C, 41154 9E, 1429 (58090) 20C, 42364 5D, 42509 33C, 42512 33C, 3456 20A, 3914 18D, 44598 16A, 47548 19A, 58209 19B, 64798 38E. New Construction: No. 42050 was ex Paint Shop on 6/9, and others up to 42057 were in various stages in the Erecting Shop. Diesels 12074/5 were completed and others up to 12079 in course of construction. No. 42146 was on trials on 6/9. Nos. 404, 40411/6 have gone into traffic ex store, but Nos. 407, 40513, 43342/64, 43482 are in store, near the station. Withdrawn: still in works Yard: 40498, 40515, 41017, 43297, 43818, 22853 (58112), 3511 (58275), 1251 (58034) and 1406 (58079). No. 41748 is ex Works, with round-top firebox. No. 58080 (0-4-4T) has appeared fully lined, with emblem. Among those repainted black with emblem are 2108 (0-6-OPT), and J.39 Nos. 64762/5/84/97, 64903/62/9, while 64906/51 still retain BRITISH RAILWAYS (not repainted). |
SLS/195012 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/10/1905 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
30/05/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2731 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1455 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
31/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
01/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/06/1929. Dep: 06/06/1929. | ||
28/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1931. Dep: 06/03/1931. | ||
27/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1932. Dep: 18/11/1932. | ||
28/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1711 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1935. Dep: 13/03/1935. | ||
22/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936. | ||
23/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1938. Dep: 16/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1710 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/06/1940. Dep: 15/07/1940. | ||
22/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/09/1941. Dep: 23/09/1941. | ||
03/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1942. Dep: 11/04/1942. | ||
17/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
17/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1943. Dep: 08/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4916 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/02/1944. Dep: 08/03/1944. | ||
05/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
21/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945. | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4784 | ||
15/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
04/11/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
21/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
04/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/11/1947. Dep: 21/11/1947. | ||
08/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1948. Dep: 25/09/1948. Work undertaken: Water scoop off Boiler number E1350 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64784 |
||
31/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/05/1950. Dep: 30/08/1950. | ||
20/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
25/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1952. Dep: 20/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27434 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1955. Dep: 30/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27431 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1957. Dep: 22/03/1957. | ||
30/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1958. Dep: 30/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27891 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1958. Dep: 13/06/1958. | ||
05/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/01/1960. Dep: 25/01/1960. | ||
20/08/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64784 from Stratford (30A) | ||
09/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |