|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/01/1933 | 28/01/1933 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2128 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1935 | 22/03/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1936 | 28/11/1936 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 2191 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1938 | 09/12/1938 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1940 | 11/01/1941 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2766 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/07/1943 | 15/10/1943 | 82 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 91 days | General | Boiler number 2123 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1947 | 30/12/1947 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 8587 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 23/11/1950 | 15/01/1951 | 54 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64805 |
||
Derby Works | 07/03/1951 | 19/03/1951 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 14/07/1952 | 01/09/1952 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 27716 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1953 | 24/12/1953 | 53 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 31/01/1955 | 19/03/1955 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 27809 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1950 | Derby Works | In addition to the normal types of L.M.S. origin, the following have come off works: 2060, 2107, 12011, 64749/82, 64807/34, 64958/9. Withdrawn engines in works yard: 3802, 20155, 22853, 58061. No. 20155 has had the number freshly painted on the smokebox door, and neatly enclosed in a white-painted rectangle. Buffer beam repainted, but boiler casing removed. Engines in for repair 2053 (82D), 12012 (8C), 12002 (5B), 64841 (32B), 64893 (36A), 64971 (40A), 64727 (9F), (6)4910 (36A), 64734 (40A), 64793 (32B), 64805 (39A), 42387/8 (87K); 7316 (71G); and the following other un-renumbered engines 7583 (26B), 2995 (18B), 524 (7B), 4294 (18A), 7131 (21A), 7298 (4A), 7300 (33A), 32 (14B); also numerous others of L.M.S. origin. Position as regards new construction on 30/11/50:-42062/3 almost complete; 42064/5 commenced; 12084/5 in paint shop, 12086 completed. Early in December another diesel, 12087 had the engines mounted, and the frames of 73000 were in the erecting shop. Among engines entering works were 509 (71G), 2988 (15B), 3827 (18A), 7503 (11C), 64802 (32A), 64979 (37A). Nos. 509, 43319 an 3827 were 'for special examination' and may not survive the ordeal. |
SLS/195101 |
13/01/1951 | Derby Works | During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. | SLS/195102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/10/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2779 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1476 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
31/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
04/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1933. Dep: 28/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2128 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/11/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
02/12/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
08/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1935. Dep: 22/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1936. Dep: 28/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2191 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1938. Dep: 09/12/1938. | ||
23/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1940. Dep: 11/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2766 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1943. Dep: 15/10/1943. | ||
26/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2123 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4805 | ||
30/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1947. Dep: 30/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8587 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
17/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
25/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bidston (BID) | ||
01/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
14/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
23/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/11/1950. Dep: 15/01/1951. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64805 |
||
07/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1951. Dep: 19/03/1951. | ||
14/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1952. Dep: 01/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27716 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
02/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/11/1953. Dep: 24/12/1953. | ||
16/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
31/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1955. Dep: 19/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27809 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
17/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
05/10/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64805 from Stratford (30A) | ||
11/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |