|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 06/04/1932 | 13/05/1932 | 38 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1934 | 17/02/1934 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 8005 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1934 | 12/12/1934 | 70 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1936 | 29/01/1937 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 2303 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1937 | 09/02/1937 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1939 | 13/01/1940 | 81 days | General | Boiler number 27487 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1940 | 09/04/1940 | 55 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1942 | 19/12/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2622 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1943 | 05/04/1943 | 4 days | Unclassified | Tender only |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/02/1945 | 17/03/1945 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27535 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/09/1947 | 29/11/1947 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 3196 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/10/1949 | 19/11/1949 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64816 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/11/1951 | 15/12/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 27538 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/03/1954 | 24/04/1954 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/04/1957 | 17/05/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27633 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. | SLS/194912 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/01/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1470 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1488 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
06/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1932. Dep: 13/05/1932. | ||
30/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1934. Dep: 17/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8005 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/10/1934. Dep: 12/12/1934. | ||
10/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1936. Dep: 29/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2303 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/02/1937. Dep: 09/02/1937. | ||
28/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
25/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1939. Dep: 13/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27487 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/02/1940. Dep: 09/04/1940. | ||
20/11/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
30/12/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
14/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1942. Dep: 19/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2622 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/04/1943. Dep: 05/04/1943. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
23/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
15/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27535 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4816 | ||
19/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1947. Dep: 29/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3196 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/10/1949. Dep: 19/11/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64816 |
||
20/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1951. Dep: 15/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27538 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/03/1954. Dep: 24/04/1954. | ||
12/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1957. Dep: 17/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27633 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
13/12/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64816 from Heaton (52B) | ||
09/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |