|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 17/08/1931 | 12/09/1931 | 27 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/10/1932 | 29/11/1932 | 42 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/01/1934 | 22/02/1934 | 31 days | General | Boiler number C1717 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/09/1934 | 24/09/1934 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/02/1935 | 11/02/1935 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/04/1935 | 13/04/1935 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/01/1936 | 01/02/1936 | 32 days | General | Boiler number C1712 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/10/1937 | 28/10/1937 | 27 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/03/1938 | 09/03/1938 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/05/1939 | 02/06/1939 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/02/1940 | 22/03/1940 | 30 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/08/1940 | 22/08/1940 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/06/1942 | 08/08/1942 | 44 days | General | Boiler number C1801 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/08/1944 | 25/08/1944 | 23 days | Heavy | |||
Inverurie Works | 26/01/1945 | 21/02/1945 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/06/1946 | 18/07/1946 | 28 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/09/1946 | 19/09/1946 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 12/08/1947 | 09/10/1947 | 59 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 21/11/1947 | 10/01/1948 | 51 days | Heavy | New cylinders |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1950 | 17/06/1950 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 27727 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64820 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1950 | 24/06/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 17/09/1952 | 04/11/1952 | 49 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1955 | 07/07/1955 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27840 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1955 | 06/08/1955 | 27 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/10/1958 | 15/11/1958 | 38 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 25845 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/02/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2786 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1492 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
17/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
17/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1931. Dep: 12/09/1931. | ||
19/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1932. Dep: 29/11/1932. | ||
23/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1934. Dep: 22/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1717 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1934. Dep: 24/09/1934. | ||
05/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/02/1935. Dep: 11/02/1935. | ||
04/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/04/1935. Dep: 13/04/1935. | ||
01/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1936. Dep: 01/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1712 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1937. Dep: 28/10/1937. | ||
08/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/03/1938. Dep: 09/03/1938. | ||
30/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/05/1939. Dep: 02/06/1939. | ||
22/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1940. Dep: 22/03/1940. | ||
21/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/08/1940. Dep: 22/08/1940. | ||
26/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1942. Dep: 08/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1801 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/08/1944. Dep: 25/08/1944. | ||
26/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/01/1945. Dep: 21/02/1945. | ||
21/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1946. Dep: 18/07/1946. | ||
18/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/09/1946. Dep: 19/09/1946. | ||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4820 | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
12/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1947. Dep: 09/10/1947. | ||
21/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/11/1947. Dep: 10/01/1948. Work undertaken: New cylinders |
||
12/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1950. Dep: 17/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27727 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64820 |
||
23/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/06/1950. Dep: 24/06/1950. | ||
21/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
17/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/09/1952. Dep: 04/11/1952. | ||
22/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1955. Dep: 07/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27840 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1955. Dep: 06/08/1955. | ||
09/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1958. Dep: 15/11/1958. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 25845 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/05/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64820 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
12/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |