|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/12/1934 | 02/01/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2273 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1937 | 10/07/1937 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 825 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/10/1939 | 02/12/1939 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 823 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/11/1942 | 09/01/1943 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 2302 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1945 | 30/03/1945 | 81 days | General | Boiler number 8594 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/07/1946 | 12/09/1946 | 63 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 01/11/1947 | 20/12/1947 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1950 | 01/04/1950 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 2669 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64826 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1950 | 10/04/1950 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 21/04/1950 | 23/04/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 25/01/1952 | 06/03/1952 | 42 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 19/07/1954 | 28/08/1954 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27890 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 18/10/1954 | 30/10/1954 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 09/06/1957 | 15/08/1957 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 27820 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/10/1931 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2965 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1534 Allocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
12/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1934. Dep: 02/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2273 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
15/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1937. Dep: 10/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 825 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1939. Dep: 02/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 823 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
25/10/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
08/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2302 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
09/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1945. Dep: 30/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8594 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
12/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/07/1946. Dep: 12/09/1946. | ||
05/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4826 | ||
01/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1947. Dep: 20/12/1947. | ||
07/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1950. Dep: 01/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2669 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64826 |
||
05/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/04/1950. Dep: 10/04/1950. | ||
21/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/04/1950. Dep: 23/04/1950. | ||
25/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/01/1952. Dep: 06/03/1952. | ||
19/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1954. Dep: 28/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27890 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1954. Dep: 30/10/1954. | ||
09/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1957. Dep: 15/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27820 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
08/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64826 from March (31B) | ||
28/02/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |