|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 18/12/1933 | 13/01/1934 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2141 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1936 | 29/07/1936 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 2110 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1938 | 02/09/1938 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 8009 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1940 | 30/11/1940 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 822 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1940 | 17/12/1940 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/04/1943 | 06/06/1943 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1944 | 08/07/1944 | 34 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1945 | 29/09/1945 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 17/02/1946 | 06/04/1946 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 27697 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1948 | 21/08/1948 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 8588 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64828 |
||
Derby Works | 02/03/1951 | 24/04/1951 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 27662 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 04/05/1951 | 14/05/1951 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1953 | 04/07/1953 | 47 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1953 | 16/07/1953 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 29/11/1953 | 09/01/1954 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 2188 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/09/1956 | 27/10/1956 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 27653 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/03/1951 | Derby Works | Early March-Un-renumbered engines entering works were 1396 (19B), 3186 (21C), 3991 (17B), 7334 (20D), 7346 (9B), 7508 (25E), 7605 (11A). For special examination 43232 (15C). From other regions 42507/24 (33A), 64713 an 64909 (36A), 64828 (38A). New construction: 73000 had boiler on 9/3, 73002/3 an 12088/9 were frames only. Additional stored engines are 404 an 43496. Engines from other regions, repainted with emblem-2183, 64907/87. Off Works lettered L.M.S.-10000, 40430, 43995/7. | SLS/195108 |
14/03/1951 | Derby Works | Early March-Un-renumbered engines entering works were 1396 (19B), 3186 (21C), 3991 (17B), 7334 (20D), 7346 (9B), 7508 (25E), 7605 (11A). For special examination 43232 (15C). From other regions 42507/24 (33A), 64713 an 64909 (36A), 64828 (38A). New construction: 73000 had boiler on 9/3: 73002/3 an 12088/9 were frames only. Additional stored engines are 404 an 43496. Engines from other regions, repainted with emblem-2183, 64907/87. Off Works lettered L.M.S.-10000, 40430, 43995/7. | SLS/195104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/10/1931 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2967 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1536 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
06/11/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
18/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1933. Dep: 13/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2141 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1936. Dep: 29/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2110 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1938. Dep: 02/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8009 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 822 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/12/1940. Dep: 17/12/1940. | ||
14/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1943. Dep: 06/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1944. Dep: 08/07/1944. | ||
23/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/09/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945. | ||
17/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27697 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4828 | ||
22/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
16/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1948. Dep: 21/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8588 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64828 |
||
02/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1951. Dep: 24/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27662 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1951. Dep: 14/05/1951. | ||
19/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/05/1953. Dep: 04/07/1953. | ||
07/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1953. Dep: 16/07/1953. | ||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
29/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1953. Dep: 09/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2188 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
20/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
10/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1956. Dep: 27/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27653 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) | ||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
21/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64828 from Mexborough (41F) | ||
04/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |