|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/03/1934 | 31/03/1934 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 8589 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1936 | 16/05/1936 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2296 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1938 | 13/09/1938 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 8023 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1940 | 16/11/1940 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2688 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/12/1940 | 13/12/1940 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 11/11/1942 | 06/02/1943 | 88 days | General | Boiler number 8018 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1945 | 23/06/1945 | 88 days | General | Boiler number 2672 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 29/07/1947 | 16/11/1947 | 111 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 15/08/1948 | 15/09/1948 | 32 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64829 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1949 | 24/12/1949 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 2114 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1950 | 21/01/1950 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Derby Works | 08/08/1952 | 08/09/1952 | 32 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 08/03/1954 | 26/03/1954 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 18/01/1955 | 26/02/1955 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27724 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 23/09/1957 | 26/10/1957 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27824 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/11/1931 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2968 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1537 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
07/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1934. Dep: 31/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8589 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2296 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1938. Dep: 13/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8023 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1940. Dep: 16/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2688 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/12/1940. Dep: 13/12/1940. | ||
11/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1942. Dep: 06/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8018 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
28/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2672 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
05/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4829 | ||
29/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1947. Dep: 16/11/1947. | ||
15/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/08/1948. Dep: 15/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64829 |
||
21/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1949. Dep: 24/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2114 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/01/1950. Dep: 21/01/1950. | ||
08/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 08/08/1952. Dep: 08/09/1952. | ||
08/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1954. Dep: 26/03/1954. | ||
18/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1955. Dep: 26/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27724 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1957. Dep: 26/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27824 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
18/05/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64829 from Ipswich (32B) |