|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 13/06/1932 | 22/06/1932 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/12/1933 | 31/01/1934 | 43 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/08/1935 | 06/09/1935 | 32 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/10/1937 | 12/11/1937 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 27483 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 28/02/1939 | 11/03/1939 | 12 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/10/1939 | 25/10/1939 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/02/1940 | 18/03/1940 | 28 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/09/1942 | 17/10/1942 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2926 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/10/1942 | 31/10/1942 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/02/1943 | 19/02/1943 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Inverurie Works | 15/09/1943 | 25/09/1943 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/08/1944 | 15/09/1944 | 19 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/08/1945 | 19/09/1945 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/10/1946 | 30/10/1946 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1948 | 03/05/1948 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 2697 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64839 |
||
Derby Works | 19/11/1951 | 22/01/1952 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 27690 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1954 | 14/01/1955 | 54 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1955 | 17/01/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1958 | 12/04/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27689 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1958 | 10/05/1958 | 6 days | Unclassified | Not repaired |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/06/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2978 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1552 Allocated to Eastfield (EFD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
13/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/06/1932. Dep: 22/06/1932. | ||
20/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1933. Dep: 31/01/1934. | ||
06/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1935. Dep: 06/09/1935. | ||
19/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1937. Dep: 12/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27483 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939. | ||
23/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/10/1939. Dep: 25/10/1939. | ||
20/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1940. Dep: 18/03/1940. | ||
11/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2926 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/10/1942. Dep: 31/10/1942. | ||
17/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/02/1943. Dep: 19/02/1943. | ||
17/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
15/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/09/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943. | ||
28/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1944. Dep: 15/09/1944. | ||
30/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/08/1945. Dep: 19/09/1945. | ||
19/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1946. Dep: 30/10/1946. | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4839 | ||
23/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
02/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1948. Dep: 03/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2697 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64839 |
||
18/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
19/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1951. Dep: 22/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27690 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/11/1954. Dep: 14/01/1955. | ||
15/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/01/1955. Dep: 17/01/1955. | ||
12/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1958. Dep: 12/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27689 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/05/1958. Dep: 10/05/1958. Work undertaken: Not repaired |
||
10/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
09/10/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64839 from Ardsley (56B) |