Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 433 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 433 Week
» 27054 Month
» 27054 Year
» 1692430 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1453 on 31/08/1932
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4842 on 10/02/1946
British Railways 64842   31/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Wed 31/08/1932 to Neville Hill (NEV)
Withdrawal Wed 18/04/1962 off Heaton (52B)
Scrapping During 01/1963
Service Life 29 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEV Neville Hill (New) on 31/08/1932
HAV Haverton Hill on 28/03/1943
BLA Blaydon on 19/06/1943
52B Heaton on 15/01/1961
   Withdrawn on 18/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52B Heaton 5w/e 04/02/1961
WDN   on 18/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
31/08/1932 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3176/5D)
22/06/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1913)
13/11/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted
22/07/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2223)
18/04/1942 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2571)
23/12/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1715)
07/06/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1739)
10/05/1952 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27543)
23/02/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27631)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 20/09/1933 25/09/1933 6 days Unclassified
Cleaned for Shildon Exhibition
 
Darlington Works 24/05/1934 22/06/1934 30 days General
Boiler number 1913 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 30/09/1936 13/11/1936 45 days General
Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 16/11/1936 26/11/1936 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 23/11/1938 05/12/1938 13 days Unclassified
Tender change
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1939 22/07/1939 26 days General
Boiler number 2223 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 17/03/1942 18/04/1942 33 days General
Boiler number 2571 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 01/02/1944 23/12/1944 327 days General
Boiler number C1715 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 05/03/1946 13/04/1946 40 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 18/02/1947 07/06/1947 110 days General
Boiler number C1739 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 18/11/1949 17/12/1949 30 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 31/03/1952 10/05/1952 41 days General
Boiler number 27543 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 03/07/1952 11/08/1952 40 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 11/01/1954 13/02/1954 34 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gateshead Works 15/09/1955 23/09/1955 9 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 23/01/1957 23/02/1957 32 days General
Not repaired
Boiler number 27631 (Diagram 97)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. SLS/195001

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/08/1932 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1453
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV)    
19/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4842    
31/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64842    
15/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
18/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64842 from Heaton (52B)    

prev prev