Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 95 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6022 Week
» 4760 Month
» 419081 Year
» 1640646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1469 on 06/10/1932
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4843   27/10/1946
British Railways 64843   26/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Thu 06/10/1932 to Neville Hill (NEV)
Withdrawal Thu 29/03/1962 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 03/1963
Service Life 29 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEV Neville Hill (New) on 06/10/1932
HAV Haverton Hill on 28/03/1943
BLA Blaydon on 19/06/1943
TWD Tweedmouth on 05/06/1949
52G Sunderland on 20/08/1961
   Withdrawn on 29/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TWD Tweedmouth w/e 11/06/1949
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 09/09/1961
WDN   on 29/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/10/1932 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3176/6D)
03/09/1937 Diagram 97 boiler fitted
03/11/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2141)
08/08/1942 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2846)
14/05/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27540)
06/09/1958 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27486)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 16/10/1934 13/11/1934 29 days General  
Darlington Works 05/08/1937 03/09/1937 30 days General
Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 21/09/1939 03/11/1939 44 days General
Boiler number 2141 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 09/11/1939 27/11/1939 19 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/01/1942 26/01/1942 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 29/06/1942 08/08/1942 41 days General
Boiler number 27535 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 19/01/1945 10/02/1945 23 days General
Boiler number 2625 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 15/02/1947 05/04/1947 50 days General  
Gateshead Works 04/06/1948 29/06/1948 26 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 31/01/1949 26/03/1949 55 days General
Renumbered to BR 64843
 
Inverurie Works 27/09/1951 09/11/1951 44 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 07/04/1953 14/05/1953 38 days General
Boiler number 27540 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 16/12/1954 31/12/1954 16 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 27/04/1956 26/05/1956 30 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 30/07/1958 06/09/1958 39 days General
Boiler number 27486 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 08/12/1960 29/12/1960 22 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/10/1932 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1469
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV)    
19/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4843    
05/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD)    
20/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
29/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64843 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev