|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 14/11/1934 | 10/12/1934 | 27 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1936 | 21/03/1936 | 34 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1938 | 20/05/1938 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1938 | 24/05/1938 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1939 | 08/12/1939 | 33 days | Unclassified | Tender only |
||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1940 | 01/08/1940 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2573 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1942 | 28/09/1942 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27479 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1943 | 17/12/1943 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/10/1944 | 25/11/1944 | 27 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/04/1946 | 25/05/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/04/1947 | 12/04/1947 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/12/1947 | 21/02/1948 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 2712 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/06/1950 | 01/07/1950 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64846 |
||
Gateshead Works | 11/10/1950 | 20/11/1950 | 41 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/12/1950 | 22/02/1951 | 66 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1953 | 05/09/1953 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 25800 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1953 | 31/10/1953 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/07/1955 | 08/08/1955 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/09/1955 | 29/09/1955 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 13/11/1958 | 19/11/1958 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/01/1959 | 21/02/1959 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 27437 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/04/1959 | 11/05/1959 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/08/1960 | 14/10/1960 | 51 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. | SLS/195008 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/05/1933 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1482 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1570 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
14/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1934. Dep: 10/12/1934. | ||
17/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1936. Dep: 21/03/1936. | ||
08/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1938. Dep: 20/05/1938. | ||
20/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1938. Dep: 24/05/1938. | ||
06/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/11/1939. Dep: 08/12/1939. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
03/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1940. Dep: 01/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2573 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1942. Dep: 28/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27479 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
23/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
30/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1943. Dep: 17/12/1943. | ||
30/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1944. Dep: 25/11/1944. | ||
20/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946. | ||
05/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4846 | ||
05/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1947. Dep: 12/04/1947. | ||
12/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1947. Dep: 21/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2712 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
28/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
03/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/06/1950. Dep: 01/07/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64846 |
||
11/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1950. Dep: 20/11/1950. | ||
19/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1950. Dep: 22/02/1951. | ||
23/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1953. Dep: 05/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25800 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/10/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953. | ||
29/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1955. Dep: 08/08/1955. | ||
19/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/09/1955. Dep: 29/09/1955. | ||
13/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/11/1958. Dep: 19/11/1958. | ||
27/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1959. Dep: 21/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27437 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1959. Dep: 11/05/1959. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
25/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/08/1960. Dep: 14/10/1960. | ||
15/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
30/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
20/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
16/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64846 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |