|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 18/02/1935 | 22/03/1935 | 33 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1936 | 26/11/1936 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2340 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1936 | 16/12/1936 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1939 | 01/07/1939 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1939 | 15/02/1940 | 72 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1941 | 25/08/1941 | 14 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1941 | 15/01/1942 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2713 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1943 | 27/11/1943 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/12/1944 | 20/01/1945 | 39 days | General | Boiler number C1738 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/03/1945 | 27/03/1945 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/05/1946 | 25/05/1946 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/10/1947 | 20/12/1947 | 76 days | General | Boiler number 2708 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/08/1948 | 04/09/1948 | 30 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64847 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/08/1950 | 02/09/1950 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/11/1950 | 17/11/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/03/1953 | 02/05/1953 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 27528 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/01/1956 | 18/02/1956 | 38 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/11/1958 | 20/12/1958 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 27454 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/07/1961 | 26/08/1961 | 31 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/08/1961 | 09/09/1961 | 10 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/09/1959 | Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed | The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. | SLS/195911 |
30/08/1961 | Cowlairs Works (Weigh House) | Erecting Shop: D2708/70/4, 44783, 45213, 45361, 61324/46/96, 65919, 80030, 90017, 90386, 90463, 90614. Valve Shop: 73077. Stripping Shop: 65923. Weigh House: 64847. Paint Shop: 73099. Works Yard: D2434, D2726, D3393, 44485, 61178, 64932, 72009, 73005, 80045, 90753. Scrap Yard: 64710 intact, 64700 being out-up. Works Shunters: D2760, D3418. | SLS/196110 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/05/1933 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1483 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1571 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
18/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1935. Dep: 22/03/1935. | ||
06/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1936. Dep: 26/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2340 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/11/1936. Dep: 16/12/1936. | ||
26/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1939. Dep: 01/07/1939. | ||
06/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/12/1939. Dep: 15/02/1940. | ||
12/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/08/1941. Dep: 25/08/1941. | ||
08/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1941. Dep: 15/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2713 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
06/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/11/1943. Dep: 27/11/1943. | ||
13/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1944. Dep: 20/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1738 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/03/1945. Dep: 27/03/1945. | ||
04/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/05/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946. | ||
05/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4847 | ||
06/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1947. Dep: 20/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2708 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
31/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
06/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/08/1948. Dep: 04/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64847 |
||
09/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/08/1950. Dep: 02/09/1950. | ||
13/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1950. Dep: 17/11/1950. | ||
11/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1953. Dep: 02/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27528 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) | ||
12/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 12/01/1956. Dep: 18/02/1956. | ||
28/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1958. Dep: 20/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27454 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
08/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
27/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/07/1961. Dep: 26/08/1961. | ||
31/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/08/1961. Dep: 09/09/1961. | ||
16/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64847 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |