Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 92 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6019 Week
» 4757 Month
» 419078 Year
» 1640643 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1468 on 17/03/1934
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4851   09/11/1946
British Railways 64851   25/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 17/03/1934 to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Withdrawal Mon 03/12/1962 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 02/1963
Service Life 28 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NPT Newport (Teeside) (New) on 17/03/1934
DAR Darlington on 05/11/1938
SKN Stockton on 16/07/1940
BLA Blaydon on 21/06/1943
DAR Darlington on 23/07/1945
Bla Alston on 02/01/1949
54C Borough Gardens on 04/01/1953
52A Gateshead on 14/06/1959
52H Tyne Dock on 26/02/1961
52G Sunderland on 20/08/1961
   Withdrawn on 03/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CPH   m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC ALS   w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC 54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 52A Gateshead on 14/06/1959
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 09/09/1961
WDN   on 03/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
17/03/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2571)
09/02/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8021)
23/12/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2100)
22/01/1942 Diagram 97 boiler fitted
27/05/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2116)
25/01/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number RS125)
10/07/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27533)
19/11/1960 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27651)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 05/04/1934 09/04/1934 5 days Unclassified
Water scoop fitted
 
Darlington Works 13/01/1936 08/02/1936 27 days General  
Darlington Works 09/12/1937 09/02/1938 63 days General
Boiler number 27459 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 10/02/1938 16/02/1938 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 16/11/1939 23/12/1939 38 days General
Boiler number 2100 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 28/12/1939 12/01/1940 16 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/12/1941 22/01/1942 37 days General
Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 24/04/1944 27/05/1944 34 days General
Boiler number 2116 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 09/02/1945 17/03/1945 37 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 19/10/1946 25/01/1947 99 days General
Boiler number 27486 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4851
 
Cowlairs Works 19/02/1949 25/06/1949 127 days General
Boiler number 2699 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64851
 
Cowlairs Works 27/07/1951 25/08/1951 30 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 10/06/1954 10/07/1954 31 days General
Boiler number 27533 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 20/10/1960 19/11/1960 31 days General
Boiler number 27651 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 06/12/1960 10/12/1960 5 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302
29/01/1955 North eastern Miscellany Class D20 62372, looking clean and polished, has been working on local passenger turns between Sunderland and Newcastle during March. On Sunday, 20th March, trains between Sunderland and West Hartlepool were diverted via Wellfield, due to work on track maintenance on the main line, and the 5.0 p.m. train from Newcastle to Liverpool hauled by V2 60964 was piloted from Sunderland by G5 67328 to give assistance up Seaton bank which is 1 in 42 for about half a mile at its steepest. On Sunday, 26th March, class 5 45316 was noted descending Seaton bank with an excursion from the Midland Region.
Locomotives used for football excursions to Sunderland on 30/3 included Nos. 76046. 61018 an 64851.
SLS/195505

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/03/1934 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1468
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
05/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
16/07/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
21/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
23/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
02/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Alston (Bla)    
04/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
26/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
20/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
03/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64851 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev