Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 93 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6020 Week
» 4758 Month
» 419079 Year
» 1640644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1488 on 14/12/1934
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4853   27/10/1946
British Railways 64853   29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 14/12/1934 to Ferryhill (Co. Durham) (FER)
Withdrawal Mon 03/12/1962 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 06/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham) (New) on 14/12/1934
BLA Blaydon on 24/08/1938
GHD Gateshead on 18/09/1949
52B Heaton on 18/10/1953
52G Sunderland on 13/12/1959
52H Tyne Dock on 30/07/1961
52G Sunderland on 20/08/1961
   Withdrawn on 03/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GHD Gateshead w/e 24/09/1949
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 5w/e 12/08/1961
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 09/09/1961
WDN   on 03/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
14/12/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2623)
16/02/1937 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2579)
07/10/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2623)
12/08/1941 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1797)
03/02/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8580)
25/05/1946 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8009)
21/08/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27452)
25/05/1960 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27431)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 19/01/1937 16/02/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 2579 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 17/02/1937 18/02/1937 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 12/09/1939 07/10/1939 26 days General
Boiler number 2623 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 11/06/1940 05/07/1940 25 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/06/1941 12/08/1941 44 days General
Boiler number 27482 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 01/01/1943 03/02/1943 34 days General
Boiler number 8580 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 14/08/1944 09/09/1944 27 days General  
Stratford Works 23/03/1946 25/05/1946 64 days General
Boiler number 8009 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 06/04/1948 29/05/1948 54 days General
Boiler number 27526 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64853
 
Cowlairs Works 16/11/1951 08/12/1951 23 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 08/07/1954 21/08/1954 45 days General
Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 08/08/1957 31/08/1957 24 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 08/03/1960 25/05/1960 79 days General
Boiler number 27431 (Diagram 97)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/12/1934 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1488
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Ferryhill (Co. Durham) (FER)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
24/08/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4853    
18/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
18/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
13/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
30/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
20/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
03/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64853 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev