Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1057 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4760 Week
» 3498 Month
» 417819 Year
» 1639384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1477 on 29/10/1934
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4857   03/11/1946
British Railways 64857   01/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 29/10/1934 to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Withdrawal Mon 03/12/1962 off Neville Hill (55H)
Scrapping During 07/1963
Service Life 28 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NPT Newport (Teeside) (New) on 29/10/1934
SEL Selby on 31/07/1939
YK York (North) on 23/10/1939
SEL Selby on 27/02/1940
SBK Starbeck on 20/07/1940
50A York (North) on 13/09/1959
51L Thornaby on 22/11/1959
55H Neville Hill on 17/06/1962
   Withdrawn on 03/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50A York (North) on 13/09/1959
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 55H Neville Hill 5w/e 07/07/1962
WDN   on 03/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/10/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2595)
18/06/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2317)
27/02/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2573)
17/01/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4932)
08/06/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27454)
11/10/1958 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27477)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 06/07/1936 17/08/1936 43 days General  
Darlington Works 18/09/1936 12/10/1936 25 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 16/06/1938 03/08/1938 49 days General  
Darlington Works 27/05/1940 18/06/1940 23 days General
Boiler number 2317 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 29/01/1943 27/02/1943 30 days General
Boiler number 2573 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 31/03/1945 28/04/1945 29 days General  
Cowlairs Works 09/11/1946 07/12/1946 29 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 06/11/1947 17/01/1948 73 days General
Boiler number 4932 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 04/08/1950 01/09/1950 29 days General
Renumbered to BR 64857
 
Cowlairs Works 24/03/1953 08/06/1953 77 days General
Boiler number 27454 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 02/11/1953 21/11/1953 20 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 03/09/1954 02/10/1954 30 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 03/11/1955 26/11/1955 24 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 09/09/1958 11/10/1958 33 days General
Boiler number 27477 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 21/11/1958 08/12/1958 18 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/09/1959 Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. SLS/195911

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/10/1934 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1477
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
31/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
23/10/1939 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
27/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
20/07/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK)    
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4857    
13/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
22/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
17/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H)    
03/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64857 from Neville Hill (55H)    

prev prev