Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 335 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6262 Week
» 5000 Month
» 419321 Year
» 1640886 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1465 on 13/11/1935
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4863   27/10/1946
British Railways 64863   07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service Wed 13/11/1935 to Sunderland (SUN)
Withdrawal Wed 31/01/1962 off Neville Hill (55H)
Scrapping During 12/1962
Service Life 26 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Cowlairs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SUN Sunderland (New) on 13/11/1935
CON Consett on 15/06/1936
DAR Darlington on 28/03/1943
TWD Tweedmouth on 04/01/1948
BLA Blaydon on 28/02/1948
HTN Heaton on 07/11/1948
50B Neville Hill on 12/02/1950
   Withdrawn on 31/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TWD Tweedmouth w/e 10/01/1948
ALLOC BLA Blaydon w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill w/e 18/02/1950
WDN   on 31/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
13/11/1935 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2712)
29/11/1941 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8022)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 28/03/1939 16/05/1939 50 days General  
Darlington Works 28/10/1941 29/11/1941 33 days General
Boiler number 27460 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 19/11/1943 08/12/1943 20 days General
Boiler number 2716 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 25/05/1946 03/08/1946 71 days General  
Cowlairs Works 23/02/1949 07/05/1949 74 days General
Renumbered to BR 64863
 
Cowlairs Works 31/01/1952 23/02/1952 24 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 17/12/1954 15/01/1955 30 days General
Boiler number 27553 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 27/01/1955 29/01/1955 3 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 19/09/1958 22/10/1958 34 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/11/1935 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1465
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Sunderland (SUN)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
15/06/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (CON)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4863    
04/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD)    
28/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
07/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
12/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
31/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64863 from Neville Hill (55H)    

prev prev