|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/02/1938 | 22/04/1938 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 2671 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/02/1941 | 29/03/1941 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2312 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 20/12/1942 | 30/01/1943 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1944 | 15/04/1944 | 98 days | General | Boiler number C1710 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1947 | 08/02/1947 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1949 | 03/09/1949 | 38 days | General | Boiler number C7963 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64881 |
||
Derby Works | 01/01/1952 | 13/02/1952 | 44 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 04/01/1955 | 12/02/1955 | 40 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27808 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/07/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2950 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1626 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
07/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
19/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
04/09/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
31/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
12/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
26/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 22/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2671 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1941. Dep: 29/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2312 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/09/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
20/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/12/1942. Dep: 30/01/1943. | ||
05/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
09/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1944. Dep: 15/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1710 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
22/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4881 | ||
26/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1947. Dep: 08/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1949. Dep: 03/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number C7963 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64881 |
||
01/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/01/1952. Dep: 13/02/1952. | ||
15/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
14/02/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
04/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1955. Dep: 12/02/1955. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27808 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/09/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64881 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
10/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |