|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1938 | 19/01/1939 | 72 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1939 | 31/01/1939 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1939 | 13/02/1939 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/06/1941 | 12/09/1941 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/01/1944 | 11/03/1944 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 2696 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1944 | 18/11/1944 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1946 | 31/08/1946 | 104 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1947 | 05/12/1947 | 62 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 07/04/1949 | 14/05/1949 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27722 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64898 |
||
Derby Works | 05/08/1952 | 29/09/1952 | 56 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 01/01/1956 | 25/02/1956 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 27736 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1956 | 06/03/1956 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/10/1956 | 23/11/1956 | 46 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 03/01/1957 | 23/02/1957 | 52 days | Heavy Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/10/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2994 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1645 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
13/03/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
09/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1938. Dep: 19/01/1939. | ||
24/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1939. Dep: 31/01/1939. | ||
02/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1939. Dep: 13/02/1939. | ||
30/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1941. Dep: 12/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
02/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2696 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/10/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944. | ||
20/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946. | ||
05/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4898 | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
05/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/10/1947. Dep: 05/12/1947. | ||
07/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1949. Dep: 14/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27722 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64898 |
||
05/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/08/1952. Dep: 29/09/1952. | ||
01/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1956. Dep: 25/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27736 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1956. Dep: 06/03/1956. | ||
09/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/10/1956. Dep: 23/11/1956. | ||
03/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/01/1957. Dep: 23/02/1957. | ||
19/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64898 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
03/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |