|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/12/1938 | 14/01/1939 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2110 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1941 | 08/11/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1944 | 08/07/1944 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 27730 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1946 | 09/05/1946 | 10 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1947 | 09/10/1947 | 9 days | General | Boiler number 4917 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1948 | 12/06/1948 | 21 days | Heavy | Renumbered to BR 64904 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1950 | 29/04/1950 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1953 | 15/12/1953 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 25805 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/04/1957 | 25/05/1957 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/12/1958 | 08/01/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 27484 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/03/1960 | 02/04/1960 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/09/1960 | 21/10/1960 | 33 days | C/I | Boiler number 2716 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/09/1959 | Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed | The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. | SLS/195911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/08/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3000 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1677 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
14/09/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
16/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1938. Dep: 14/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2110 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1941. Dep: 08/11/1941. | ||
20/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1944. Dep: 08/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27730 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
30/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1946. Dep: 09/05/1946. | ||
18/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4904 | ||
01/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1947. Dep: 09/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4917 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/05/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64904 |
||
05/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1950. Dep: 29/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
07/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
13/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1953. Dep: 15/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25805 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
10/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
24/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/04/1957. Dep: 25/05/1957. | ||
11/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1958. Dep: 08/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27484 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
22/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
08/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1960. Dep: 02/04/1960. | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
19/09/1960 | Works Visit | |||
09/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
22/10/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64904 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
12/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |