Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 82 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6009 Week
» 4747 Month
» 419068 Year
» 1640633 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1856 on 30/09/1936
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4910   18/08/1946
British Railways 64910   08/02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 1529
Works Number 6807
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service Fri 30/09/1936 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Fri 23/11/1962 off Alnmouth (52d)
Scrapping During 05/1963
Service Life 26 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Cowlairs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) on 30/09/1936
CLK Colwick on 24/10/1936
DON Doncaster on 23/08/1946
53A Hull Dairycoates on 02/09/1951
51D Middlesbrough on 18/11/1951
51C West Hartlepool on 14/09/1952
51J Northallerton on 19/09/1954
51F West Auckland on 06/03/1955
54A Sunderland on 25/09/1955
53A Hull Dairycoates on 10/06/1956
55H Neville Hill on 11/09/1960
52B Heaton on 15/01/1961
52d Alnmouth on 19/08/1962
   Withdrawn on 23/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates on 02/09/1951
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough w/e 24/11/1951
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 51J Northallerton 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 55H Neville Hill 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 52B Heaton 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 52DALN   4w/e 08/09/1962
WDN   on 23/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
30/09/1936 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number E1355)
14/09/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4915)
25/02/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4908)
26/10/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3197)
23/07/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2301)
08/02/1951 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27652)
23/05/1959 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 25804)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 01/09/1938 22/09/1938 22 days General  
Gorton Works 31/08/1940 14/09/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 4915 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1943 25/02/1943 9 days General
Boiler number 4908 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1944 26/10/1944 9 days General
Boiler number 3197 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1947 23/07/1947 24 days General
Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97)
 
Derby Works 30/11/1950 08/02/1951 71 days General
Boiler number 27652 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64910
 
Cowlairs Works 21/05/1954 24/06/1954 35 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 26/07/1956 22/09/1956 59 days General
Boiler number 27550 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 30/12/1959 29/01/1960 31 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1951 Derby Works During the second half of January new construction comprised some work on Nos. 73000/1, the cylinders of the former being positioned. No. 10100 has been outside the diesel shop for some days. Condemned locos. in the Works yard: 40370, 41012, 41824 (from W.R.), also the N.L. Crane 58865. No. 22853 was still in Works, not cut up, on 26/1. In store near the station: 43429 (17C), and 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361 (17A), all 17A. Engines from other Regions under repair: 42328, 42506/23, 58043 (33A), 42394 (87K), 44518 (35C), 64728 (40A), 64751, 64911 (37A), 64987 (36C). Most engines now leave shops with the B.R. emblem, but 42371 an 47473 have come off lettered BRITISH RAILWAYS, while tenders so lettered are attached to 43757, 44576 an 58265. Engines off shops with tanks or tenders lettered L.M.S. are 42335, 41101, 43395, 44002/15: apparently Derby has a lingering affection for this lettering, which became obsolete three years ago!! W2043 has come off without emblem, but with W prefix under the numberplate. No. 58071, lined with emblem, is freshly out still with round-topped firebox. Several J.39 class have come off shops, 64793, 64910/79 (repainted with emblem) and 64714 (renumbered-with emblem-but not repainted). Un-renumbered engines in shops include 326 (20A), 580 (27D), 7295 (12A), 7339 (11A), 7391 (12A). No. 326 is the last of the S. & D.J. engines to get its B.R. number, which will be its fourth: originally No. 69, it became 43 in 1928, and 326 in March 1930. Latterly it has been working in the Leeds area. SLS/195103
28/02/1951 Derby Works During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned.
At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic.
SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1856
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6807
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
24/10/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4910    
23/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
18/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
14/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
19/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Northallerton (51J)    
06/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
25/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
10/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
23/05/1959 Modification Diagram 97 number 25804 boiler fitted    
11/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H)    
15/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
19/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Alnmouth (52d)    
23/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64910 from Alnmouth (52D.1)    

prev prev