Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 91 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6018 Week
» 4756 Month
» 419077 Year
» 1640642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1551 on 16/03/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4942   18/08/1946
British Railways 64942   03/06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service Mon 16/03/1938 to Middlesbrough (MID)
Withdrawal Mon 03/12/1962 off Heaton (52B)
Scrapping During 07/1963
Service Life 24 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MID Middlesbrough (New) on 16/03/1938
SKN Stockton on 01/01/1940
BLA Blaydon on 19/06/1943
DAR Darlington on 23/07/1945
SBK Starbeck on 29/08/1948
50A York (North) on 13/09/1959
52G Sunderland on 20/03/1960
52B Heaton on 14/01/1962
   Withdrawn on 03/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SBK Starbeck w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 50A York (North) on 13/09/1959
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 16/04/1960
ALLOC 52B Heaton 5w/e 03/02/1962
WDN   on 03/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
16/03/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2939)
27/07/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2946)
15/01/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2935)
21/10/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2099)
11/10/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2936)
14/04/1956 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27700)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 24/06/1940 27/07/1940 34 days General
Boiler number 2946 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 19/12/1941 21/01/1942 34 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 17/12/1942 15/01/1943 30 days General
Boiler number 2935 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 21/09/1944 21/10/1944 31 days General
Boiler number 2099 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 07/03/1945 24/03/1945 18 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 19/06/1947 11/10/1947 115 days General
Boiler number 2936 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 03/05/1950 03/06/1950 32 days General
Boiler number 275 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64942
 
Cowlairs Works 07/04/1953 26/04/1953 20 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 16/02/1956 14/04/1956 59 days General
Boiler number 27700 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 10/07/1959 22/08/1959 44 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 12/04/1960 04/05/1960 23 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 03/10/1961 04/10/1961 2 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
24/08/1947 Cowlairs Works On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. SLS/194710
30/10/1947 Eastfield MPD Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. SLS/194712
13/09/1959 Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. SLS/195911

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/03/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1551
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Middlesbrough (MID)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
01/01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
19/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
23/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4942    
29/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK)    
13/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
20/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
14/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
03/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64942 from Heaton (52B)    

prev prev