|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1938 | 10/01/1939 | 77 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1941 | 31/05/1941 | 63 days | General | Boiler number E1354 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1942 | 27/02/1943 | 109 days | General | Boiler number 3209 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/10/1945 | 19/01/1946 | 95 days | General | Boiler number 2720 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/11/1947 | 31/01/1948 | 89 days | General | Boiler number 2675 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4955 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1949 | 27/08/1949 | 60 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 64955 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1949 | 22/10/1949 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Derby Works | 08/04/1951 | 08/06/1951 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 27665 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1953 | 11/05/1953 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 27757 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1955 | 02/09/1955 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27791 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1957 | 24/08/1957 | 45 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 27531 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1958 | 13/12/1958 | 34 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/04/1951 | Derby Works | On 24/4/1951 new 5MT 73001 was complete, 73002/3 had the boilers mounted on the frames, 73004 has frames only in position. New Diesel shunter 12088 was almost complete, 12089 frames only. In the works, the following interesting engines were in for repairs: (40)487, 41536, 47004. Additional engines stored near station are: (40)404, 40426, 43496. Two J39 class were in works : 64953/5. By 5/5/1951, 73002 was almost complete; in addition, 41005 was in works for special examination, 41020 for general repairs, 41844 also for special examination. 58865 was in the works yard covered with a tarpaulin, and 40462 an 22970 were nearby. | SLS/195106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/05/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1927 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1751 Allocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
26/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 26/10/1938. Dep: 10/01/1939. | ||
28/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
30/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1941. Dep: 31/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number E1354 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/04/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
11/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1942. Dep: 27/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3209 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
17/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1945. Dep: 19/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2720 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4955 | ||
30/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
04/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1947. Dep: 31/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2675 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4955 |
||
29/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/06/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64955 |
||
05/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949. | ||
08/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1951. Dep: 08/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27665 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1953. Dep: 11/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27757 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1955. Dep: 02/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27791 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/07/1957. Dep: 24/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27531 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
10/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/11/1958. Dep: 13/12/1958. | ||
25/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
05/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
21/07/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64955 from Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
12/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |