|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 30/06/1940 | 03/08/1940 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27546 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/06/1943 | 29/08/1943 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 2317 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 09/07/1944 | 29/07/1944 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 19/10/1945 | 01/11/1945 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 24/02/1946 | 02/05/1946 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 2684 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4959 |
||
Stratford Works | 15/06/1947 | 28/08/1947 | 75 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1948 | 16/10/1948 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64959 |
||
Derby Works | 25/08/1950 | 01/11/1950 | 69 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 07/10/1952 | 03/12/1952 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 27735 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 10/12/1952 | 05/01/1953 | 27 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 12/01/1953 | 21/01/1953 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 29/01/1953 | 20/02/1953 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1955 | 05/11/1955 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 27797 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/09/1950 | Derby Works | For works during first half of September: 40653 4B, 41050/9 14B, 41065 23C, 41118 8E, 42325 14B, 42533 33A, 43754 22B, 43959 18C, 43968 and M4010 21A, 44164 an 44402 17A, 44174 17D, 7588 5C, 7635 22B, 58137 16C, 64883 40A, 40410 35C, 41062 19B, 41068 20A, 1251 (58034) 22B, 42339 16A, 42344 5D, 42345 5C, 43246 an 43435 21A, 43344 22B, 3650 18A, 43819 18A, 43925 20D, 44180 17C, 44355 22A, 7481 87K, 22945 (58136) 20B, 58237 20C, 64757 38A, 64959 32A, 40001 11A, 40351 20A, 426 17A, 41001 22B, 41004 20E, 41006 15C, 41067 20E, 41095 15C, 41154 9E, 1429 (58090) 20C, 42364 5D, 42509 33C, 42512 33C, 3456 20A, 3914 18D, 44598 16A, 47548 19A, 58209 19B, 64798 38E. New Construction: No. 42050 was ex Paint Shop on 6/9, and others up to 42057 were in various stages in the Erecting Shop. Diesels 12074/5 were completed and others up to 12079 in course of construction. No. 42146 was on trials on 6/9. Nos. 404, 40411/6 have gone into traffic ex store, but Nos. 407, 40513, 43342/64, 43482 are in store, near the station. Withdrawn: still in works Yard: 40498, 40515, 41017, 43297, 43818, 22853 (58112), 3511 (58275), 1251 (58034) and 1406 (58079). No. 41748 is ex Works, with round-top firebox. No. 58080 (0-4-4T) has appeared fully lined, with emblem. Among those repainted black with emblem are 2108 (0-6-OPT), and J.39 Nos. 64762/5/84/97, 64903/62/9, while 64906/51 still retain BRITISH RAILWAYS (not repainted). |
SLS/195012 |
30/11/1950 | Derby Works | In addition to the normal types of L.M.S. origin, the following have come off works: 2060, 2107, 12011, 64749/82, 64807/34, 64958/9. Withdrawn engines in works yard: 3802, 20155, 22853, 58061. No. 20155 has had the number freshly painted on the smokebox door, and neatly enclosed in a white-painted rectangle. Buffer beam repainted, but boiler casing removed. Engines in for repair 2053 (82D), 12012 (8C), 12002 (5B), 64841 (32B), 64893 (36A), 64971 (40A), 64727 (9F), (6)4910 (36A), 64734 (40A), 64793 (32B), 64805 (39A), 42387/8 (87K); 7316 (71G); and the following other un-renumbered engines 7583 (26B), 2995 (18B), 524 (7B), 4294 (18A), 7131 (21A), 7298 (4A), 7300 (33A), 32 (14B); also numerous others of L.M.S. origin. Position as regards new construction on 30/11/50:-42062/3 almost complete; 42064/5 commenced; 12084/5 in paint shop, 12086 completed. Early in December another diesel, 12087 had the engines mounted, and the frames of 73000 were in the erecting shop. Among engines entering works were 509 (71G), 2988 (15B), 3827 (18A), 7503 (11C), 64802 (32A), 64979 (37A). Nos. 509, 43319 an 3827 were 'for special examination' and may not survive the ordeal. |
SLS/195101 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/05/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1940 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1756 Allocated to Stratford (STR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
30/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1940. Dep: 03/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27546 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/01/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
06/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1943. Dep: 29/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2317 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/07/1944. Dep: 29/07/1944. | ||
19/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1945. Dep: 01/11/1945. | ||
24/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1946. Dep: 02/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2684 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4959 |
||
06/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
26/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
15/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/06/1947. Dep: 28/08/1947. | ||
29/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1948. Dep: 16/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64959 |
||
25/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/08/1950. Dep: 01/11/1950. | ||
30/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
14/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
20/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
07/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1952. Dep: 03/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27735 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/12/1952. Dep: 05/01/1953. | ||
12/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/01/1953. Dep: 21/01/1953. | ||
29/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/01/1953. Dep: 20/02/1953. | ||
22/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
30/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1955. Dep: 05/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27797 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
01/01/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64959 from Lincoln (40A) |