|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/05/1943 | 21/08/1943 | 105 days | General | Boiler number 4913 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/09/1943 | 22/09/1943 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 20/01/1946 | 06/04/1946 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 2188 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4974 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/07/1948 | 28/08/1948 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 8583 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64974 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1950 | 20/05/1950 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 2667 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1950 | 31/05/1950 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1950 | 30/06/1950 | 25 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1953 | 11/04/1953 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 27752 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1953 | 16/04/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1955 | 13/08/1955 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 27844 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1955 | 27/08/1955 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1958 | 22/02/1958 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27795 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1958 | 12/03/1958 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1958 | 02/08/1958 | 37 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/03/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3084 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1852 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
30/03/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
09/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4913 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1943. Dep: 22/09/1943. | ||
25/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2188 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4974 |
||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
16/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1948. Dep: 28/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8583 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64974 |
||
17/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1950. Dep: 20/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2667 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1950. Dep: 31/05/1950. | ||
06/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/06/1950. Dep: 30/06/1950. | ||
12/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1953. Dep: 11/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27752 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1953. Dep: 16/04/1953. | ||
14/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1955. Dep: 13/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27844 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1955. Dep: 27/08/1955. | ||
10/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1958. Dep: 22/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27795 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1958. Dep: 12/03/1958. | ||
27/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/06/1958. Dep: 02/08/1958. | ||
31/08/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64974 from Colwick (40E) | ||
09/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |