Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 958 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18761 Week
» 71777 Month
» 191304 Year
» 3218157 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
166 |
m/e |
03/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3166 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1945) |
3188 |
m/e |
06/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8898 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68898 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
276 |
Works Number |
1423 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1914 to Ardsley (ARD) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/01/1960 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
56B |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/01/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 166 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1423 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3166 |
|
|
06/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3188 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8898 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68898 |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
04/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68898 |
|
|