Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3127 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16533 Week
» 69549 Month
» 189076 Year
» 3215929 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2793 |
m/e |
04/1930 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8976 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
68976 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Departmental |
16 |
m/e |
09/1962 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
318 |
Works Number |
1739 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1930 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1962 |
Service Life |
32 yrs , 5 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2793 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1739 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8976 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68976 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
20/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
09/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 16 |
|
|
09/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 16 |
|
|