Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 166 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17969 Week
» 70985 Month
» 190512 Year
» 3217365 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1253 |
m/e |
12/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4253 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8852 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
68852 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
227 |
Works Number |
946 |
To Service |
During 12/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 31/12/1955 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1901 |
NWE |
|
New England |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
38A |
|
Colwick |
4w/e |
22/01/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
31/12/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
31/12/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1253 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 946 |
|
|
02/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4253 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8852 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68852 |
|
|
22/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68852 |
|
|